RI S0041 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the participation and input of the EOHHS, DHS, DCYF and BHDDH in medical assistance and public assistance caseload estimating conferences and the generation of monthly data to the members of the case load estimating conference.
Title
Medical Assistance And Public Assistance Caseload Estimating Conferences
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Thomas Paolino [R] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] |
Sen. Melissa Murray [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/24/2021) |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/22/2021) |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2021) |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |