RI S0040 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Internet service providers to follow Internet service neutrality requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Internet Service Providers - Net Neutrality

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HouseReferred to House Corporations
2019-04-30SenateSenate read and passed
2019-04-24SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (04/30/2019)
2019-04-23SenateCommittee recommends passage
2019-04-19SenateScheduled for consideration (04/23/2019)
2019-04-02SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-03-29SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2019)
2019-01-16SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Commerce

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback