RI S0038 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the city of East Providence to grant a retailer's Class B license to property located at 136 Taunton Avenue, Map 106, Block 6, Parcel 15 of the applicable city of East Providence tax assessment map.
Title
Retail Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-15 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-27 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2023-06-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-06-15 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2023-06-13 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/15/2023) |
2023-06-12 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2023-06-09 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/12/2023) |
2023-03-08 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/07/2023) |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2023) |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |