RI S0038 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts property located at 122 North Main Street in the city of Woonsocket from the provision requiring it to be located a certain distance from objectors/schools/churches regarding the issuance of retail liquor licenses.
Title
Retail Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-02 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/02/2019) |
2019-03-28 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-03-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/28/2019) |
2019-03-21 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2019) |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/05/2019) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2019) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |