RI S0036 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages (would Allow Kristen L. Forbes To Join Jessica Brame And Jeff Holden In Marriage Within The Town Of New Shoreham, Rhode Island, On Or About June 22, 2013.)
Title
An Act Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages (would Allow Kristen L. Forbes To Join Jessica Brame And Jeff Holden In Marriage Within The Town Of New Shoreham, Rhode Island, On Or About June 22, 2013.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-03-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-03-07 | Senate | House passed in concurrence |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (03/07/2013) |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/26/2013) |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (02/06/2013) |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/29/2013) |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0036.pdf |