RI S0032 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for abortion coverage in the Medicaid program and repeals the abortion coverage exclusion for state employee insurance plans.
Title
Health Care For Children And Pregnant Women--equality In Abortion Coverage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-18 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 46 N: 20 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 14 N: 49 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-18 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 16 N: 49 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 14 N: 49 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-18 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 16 N: 49 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-05-18 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2023-05-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/18/2023) |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/18/2023) |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/16/2023) |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2023) |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |