RI S0032 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the state to reimburse Central Coventry Fire District for all costs associated with compliance with Pub L. 2014, ch. 31, which brought all fire districts in the state within the purview of the state laws on budget commissions.
Title
Budget Commissions - Central Coventry Fire District
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2017) |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0032.pdf |