RI S0030 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-14 - Meeting postponed (03/14/2023)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Defines light duty, non-emergency, emergency and zero-emission vehicles and requires the state to convert its fleet of vehicles to no less than fifty percent (50%) of vehicles in those categories by the year 2031.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department Of Administration

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-14SenateMeeting postponed (03/14/2023)
2023-03-10SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2023-01-18SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Finance

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback