RI S0028 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the rate of reimbursement for in-network behavioral health care services below the medial commercial reimbursement rate and also Rhode Island Medicaid shall increase the rate of reimbursement.
Title
Insurance Coverage For Mental Illness And Substance Abuse
Sponsors
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] |
Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Pamela Lauria [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2023) |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/SenateText23/S0028.pdf |