RI S0027 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals the current chapter of the general laws regarding immunity for food donors to food banks, and would adopt a new chapter with comprehensive immunity provisions for persons involved in donating food to food banks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Food Donations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-24 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08SenateSigned by Governor
2019-07-03SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-06-24HouseHouse passed Sub A in concurrence
2019-06-20HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (06/24/2019)
2019-06-19HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2019-06-14HouseScheduled for consideration (06/19/2019)
2019-06-12HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-06-07HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/12/2019)
2019-06-07HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2019-06-06SenateSenate passed Sub A
2019-06-04SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/06/2019)
2019-05-30SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2019-05-29SenateProposed Substitute
2019-05-23SenateScheduled for consideration (05/30/2019)
2019-04-25SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-04-19SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2019)
2019-01-15SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback