RI S0025 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Excludes municipal and government bodies that aggregate electrical loads for residential retail customers from the requirement that a new contract is required when there is a change of terms for electric-generation services.
Title
Nonregulated Power Producer Consumer Bill Of Rights
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2021-06-29 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-28 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-06-25 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2021) |
2021-06-02 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/01/2021) |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/27/2021) |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Meeting postponed (05/06/2021) |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/08/2021) |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |