RI S0025 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits fishing in trout waters at any time of year without seasonal restriction.
Title
Freshwater Fishing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2017) |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0025.pdf |