RI S0020 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits grandfathering the licensing of barbers, hairdressers, cosmeticians, manicurists and estheticians on the basis of work experience or work in another state.
Title
Barbers, Hairdressers, Cosmeticians, Manicurists And Estheticians
Sponsors
Sen. Marc Cote [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-14 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-06-09 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/14/2017) |
2017-05-30 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-05-26 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/30/2017) |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/28/2017) |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (03/21/2017) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2017) |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |