RI S0017 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sunsets/discontinues the Jobs Development Act rate reduction as of July 1, 2019.
Title
Jobs Development Act
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2019) |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0017.pdf |