RI S0015 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating To Food And Drugs - Raw Milk (would Establish Procedures And Standards Promulgated By The Milk Commission For The Handling And Sale Of Raw Milk In The State.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Relating To Food And Drugs - Raw Milk (would Establish Procedures And Standards Promulgated By The Milk Commission For The Handling And Sale Of Raw Milk In The State.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-27SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2013-02-25SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2013)
2013-01-16SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback