RI S0006 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Department of health to promulgate rules and regulations for essential caregivers at nursing homes during a declared emergency.
Title
Rights Of Nursing Home Patients
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-28 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-08 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-28 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-25 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/28/2021) |
2021-06-25 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-23 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2021) |
2021-06-02 | House | Referred to House Health & Human Services |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/01/2021) |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/27/2021) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/21/2021) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |