RI S0005 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-19 - House passed in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-19 - House passed in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Respectfully Requesting That All Branches Of State Government Continue To Collaborate On Policy Actions And Investments To Implement The Findings And Recommendations Of The Justice Reinvestment Initiative Facilitated By The Council Of State Governments Justice Center
Title
Joint Resolution Respectfully Requesting That All Branches Of State Government Continue To Collaborate On Policy Actions And Investments To Implement The Findings And Recommendations Of The Justice Reinvestment Initiative Facilitated By The Council Of State Governments Justice Center
Sponsors
Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Sen. Paul Jabour [D] | Sen. Harold Metts [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-19 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-09-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-09-15 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-09-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (09/15/2017) |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (02/02/2017) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (01/31/2017) |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/19/2017) |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |