RI H5494 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating To Animals And Animal Husbandry (would Expand The Meaning Of Unnecessary Cruelty To One Who Willfully, Intentionally, Maliciously, Recklessly And/or Knowingly Authorizes Or Permits That Animal To Be Subjected To Unnecessary Torture, Suffering Or Cruelty Of Any Kind)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Relating To Animals And Animal Husbandry (would Expand The Meaning Of Unnecessary Cruelty To One Who Willfully, Intentionally, Maliciously, Recklessly And/or Knowingly Authorizes Or Permits That Animal To Be Subjected To Unnecessary Torture, Suffering Or Cruelty Of Any Kind)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-11SenateSigned by Governor
2013-07-08SenateTransmitted to Governor
2013-07-01HouseHouse passed Sub B in concurrence
2013-07-01HousePlaced on House Calendar (07/01/2013)
2013-06-25SenateSenate passed Sub B
2013-06-20SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/25/2013)
2013-06-19SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub B
2013-06-16SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2013)
2013-05-21SenateReferred to Senate Environment and Agriculture
2013-05-07HouseHouse passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
2013-04-25HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/07/2013)
2013-04-24HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2013-04-22HouseScheduled for consideration (04/24/2013)
2013-03-20HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2013-03-15HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2013)
2013-02-14HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback