RI H5425 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates building energy performance standards based on the size of buildings, to achieve, by way of benchmarking and reporting, a statewide analysis of energy use and strategies to increase energy efficiency.
Title
The Green Buildings Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2023) |
2023-02-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H5425.pdf |