RI H8349 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 21 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows voters to change their party affiliation on or before the thirtieth day preceding a primary, and require the filing of financial statements thirty (30) days after organization of a campaign committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Elections

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-23HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-06-22HouseScheduled for consideration (06/23/2018)
2018-06-22HouseScheduled for consideration (06/22/2018)
2018-06-21HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback