RI H8349 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require all RI hospitals to annually compile a list of the average charges for 25 most commonly performed outpatient and inpatient procedures and to submit these lists to the department of health.
Title
Hospital Charges
Sponsors
Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Elaine Coderre [D] |
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 60 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-19 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2014-06-19 | House | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-18 | House | House read and passed |
2014-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-18 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2014-06-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-17 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |