RI H8333 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the director of the department of health to develop best practices for co-prescribing opioid antagonists to patients who are prescribed opioid analgesics and allows police and medical personnel to provide an opioid antagonist.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Good Samaritan Overdose Prevention Act Of 2016

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-23 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02SenateSigned by Governor
2018-07-02SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-23HouseHouse passed Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-23HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-23SenateSenate passed Sub A
2018-06-23SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-23SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-22SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/22/2018)
2018-06-22SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2018-06-20HouseHouse read and passed
2018-06-20HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/20/2018)
2018-06-20HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-06-20HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/20/2018)
2018-06-20HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback