RI H8323 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Combines the individual cost recovery limits for division of public utilities and commission proceedings, and related appeal court expenses into an aggregate limit of $1,000,000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Utilities Commission

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20HouseHouse read and passed
2018-06-20HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/20/2018)
2018-06-20HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-06-20HouseScheduled for consideration (06/20/2018)
2018-06-19HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-06-16HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2018)
2018-06-15HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback