RI H8318 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the city of Central Falls to exempt Plat 1, Lot 171 in Central Falls from the provisions of ยง 3-17-19 thereby making a business located on that property to be eligible to obtain a Class B liquor license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retail Licenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-21 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-05HouseEffective without Governor's signature
2018-06-27HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-21SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2018-06-21SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/21/2018)
2018-06-20HouseHouse read and passed
2018-06-19HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/20/2018)
2018-06-19HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-06-16HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2018)
2018-06-14HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback