RI H8313 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-23 - House read and passed
Hearing: Jun 23 House H.E.W. Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the director of the department of health to develop best practices for co-prescribing opioid antagonists to patients who are prescribed opioid analgesics.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Naloxone Access

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-23HouseHouse read and passed
2018-06-23HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-23HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-06-22HouseScheduled for consideration (06/23/2018)
2018-06-19HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-06-18HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2018)
2018-06-13HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback