RI H8308 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the Honorable Marvin L. Abney to join Kerry-Ann Edmondson and Paris McGee in marriage on or about June 25, 2022, within the Town of Bristol, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-14 - House - Solemnization Of Marriage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-21 | House | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-16 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/16/2022) |
2022-06-14 | House | House read and passed |
2022-06-10 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/14/2022) |
2022-06-08 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-06-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/08/2022) |
2022-06-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Special Legislation |