RI H8307 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing The Town Of Cumberland To Issue Not To Exceed $83,000,000 General Obligation Bonds, Notes And Other Evidences Of Indebtedness To Finance The Construction, Renovation, Improvement, Alteration, Repair, Furnishing And Equipping Of Schools And School Facilities Throughout The Town, Subject To Approval Of State Housing Aid At A Reimbursement Rate Or State Share Ratio Of Not Less Than 50% For Expenditures Eligible For State Aid And Provided That The Authorization Shall Be Reduced By Any Grant Received From The School Building Authority Capital Fund
Title
Authorizing The Town Of Cumberland To Issue Not To Exceed $83,000,000 General Obligation Bonds, Notes And Other Evidences Of Indebtedness To Finance The Construction, Renovation, Improvement, Alteration, Repair, Furnishing And Equipping Of Schools And School Facilities Throughout The Town, Subject To Approval Of State Housing Aid At A Reimbursement Rate Or State Share Ratio Of Not Less Than 50% For Expenditures Eligible For State Aid And Provided That The Authorization Shall Be Reduced By Any Grant Received From The School Building Authority Capital Fund
Sponsors
Rep. James McLaughlin [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Alex Marszalkowski [D] | Rep. Robert Phillips [D] |
Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-05 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2018-06-27 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-22 | House | House read and passed |
2018-06-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2018) |
2018-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-06-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2018) |
2018-06-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |