RI H8307 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing The Town Of Cumberland To Issue Not To Exceed $83,000,000 General Obligation Bonds, Notes And Other Evidences Of Indebtedness To Finance The Construction, Renovation, Improvement, Alteration, Repair, Furnishing And Equipping Of Schools And School Facilities Throughout The Town, Subject To Approval Of State Housing Aid At A Reimbursement Rate Or State Share Ratio Of Not Less Than 50% For Expenditures Eligible For State Aid And Provided That The Authorization Shall Be Reduced By Any Grant Received From The School Building Authority Capital Fund

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing The Town Of Cumberland To Issue Not To Exceed $83,000,000 General Obligation Bonds, Notes And Other Evidences Of Indebtedness To Finance The Construction, Renovation, Improvement, Alteration, Repair, Furnishing And Equipping Of Schools And School Facilities Throughout The Town, Subject To Approval Of State Housing Aid At A Reimbursement Rate Or State Share Ratio Of Not Less Than 50% For Expenditures Eligible For State Aid And Provided That The Authorization Shall Be Reduced By Any Grant Received From The School Building Authority Capital Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-05HouseEffective without Governor's signature
2018-06-27HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-23SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2018-06-23SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-22HouseHouse read and passed
2018-06-20HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/22/2018)
2018-06-20HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-06-20HouseScheduled for consideration (06/20/2018)
2018-06-08HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback