RI H8290 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes a police chief emeritus special license plate for Gary Malikowski, former police chief of West Greenwich.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Registration Of Vehicles -- Police Chief Emeritus Gary Malikowski

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-10HouseEffective without Governor's signature
2018-07-02HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-21SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2018-06-21SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/21/2018)
2018-06-20HouseHouse read and passed
2018-06-20HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/20/2018)
2018-06-20HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-06-20HouseScheduled for consideration (06/20/2018)
2018-06-12HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-06-08HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/12/2018)
2018-06-06HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback