RI H8285 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-02 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-02 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts from taxation the real and tangible personal property of Cape Verdean Museum Exhibit, located in Pawtucket.
Title
Property Subject To Taxation
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Alzate [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Joshua Giraldo [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] |
Rep. Brianna Henries [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. Leonela Felix [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-17 - House - Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-02 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2022-06-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-17 | House | House read and passed |
2022-06-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2022) |
2022-06-15 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-06-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/15/2022) |
2022-05-31 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-05-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/31/2022) |
2022-05-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |