RI H8281 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates a reporting requirement for state agencies and departments for violations of the fair employment practices chapter and the Equal Opportunity and Affirmative chapter. The act would also remove legislative branch exclusion from "agency" definition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fair Employment Practices

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-07HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-06-05HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/07/2018)
2018-06-01HouseIntroduced, referred to House Labor

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback