RI H8274 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study The Low And Moderate Income Act (this Resolution Would Extend The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Legislative Commission To Study The Low And Moderate Income Act From May 30, 2017, To May 30, 2019, And Said Commission Would Expire On July 30, 2019.)
Title
House Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study The Low And Moderate Income Act (this Resolution Would Extend The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Legislative Commission To Study The Low And Moderate Income Act From May 30, 2017, To May 30, 2019, And Said Commission Would Expire On July 30, 2019.)
Sponsors
Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Michael Morin [D] | Rep. Jeremiah O'Grady [D] |
Rep. Lauren Carson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | House | House read and passed |
2018-06-08 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/13/2018) |
2018-06-06 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-06-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2018) |
2018-06-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |