RI H8273 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-23 - Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/23/2018)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires RIPTA to hold public hearing at least 30 days prior any bus route change in the affected neighborhood and provide a neighborhood impact statement to local and state officials.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Transit Authority

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-23SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-22HouseHouse read and passed
2018-06-20HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/22/2018)
2018-06-20HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-06-19HouseScheduled for consideration (06/20/2018)
2018-06-19HouseCommittee transferred to House Corporations
2018-06-06HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-06-04HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2018)
2018-06-01HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback