RI H8267 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Newport and the town of Middletown to establish a regional school district.
Title
Authorizing The City Of Newport And Town Of Middletown To Establish A Regional School District And Providing For State Aid For School Housing Costs At School Housing Reimbursement Rates For Regional School Districts Which, Including Incentives, May Exceed 80% Of Debt Service For Expenditures Eligible For State Aid
Sponsors
Rep. Marvin Abney [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] | Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] | Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | House | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-22 | House | House passed Sub A |
2022-06-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2022) |
2022-06-21 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-06-20 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2022-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2022) |
2022-06-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-06-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/07/2022) |
2022-05-19 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |