RI H8265 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- TIVERTON SCHOOL COMMITTEE FINANCIAL REPORTS ACT - Authorizes the Town of Tiverton to require the school committee and quasi-municipal entities to provide regular financial reports to the chief financial officer or other designated town official.
Title
Authorizes the Town of Tiverton to require the school committee and quasi-municipal entities to provide regular financial reports to the chief financial officer or other designated town official.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-05-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/30/2024) |
2024-05-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H8265.pdf |