RI H8255 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-02 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-02 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Approves Warwick city charter amendments increasing mayor's term of office from 2 to 4 yrs, limited to 2 consecutive terms limiting council members to 6 consecutive 2 yr. terms effective 1/1/25 subject to general/special election voter approval.
Title
Relating To Authorizing The Amendment Of The Warwick City Charter Regarding New Elected Term Lengths And Term Limits For Mayor And Council Elective Terms Commencing January, 2025
Sponsors
Rep. Evan Shanley [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] |
Rep. Patricia Morgan [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-02 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2022-06-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-22 | House | House read and passed |
2022-06-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2022) |
2022-06-21 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2022) |
2022-05-31 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-05-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing (05/31/2022) |
2022-05-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |