RI H8244 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires all aquaculture leases granted by the coastal resources management council (CRMC) to be located at least one thousand feet (1,000') from the median high tide/tide line.
Title
Relating To Fish And Wildlife – Aquaculture
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-06-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/07/2022) |
2022-05-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H8244.pdf |