RI H8236 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
I) OF CHAPTER 330 OF THE 1991 PUBLIC LAWS ENTITLED "AUTHORIZING THE TOWNS OF BRISTOL AND WARREN TO ESTABLISH A REGIONAL SCHOOL DISTRICT" (This act would allow the Bristol Warren Regional School District to apportion total education cost on a rolling average per pupil calculation over a thirteen (13) year period.
Title
In Amendment Of Section Vii
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-19 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2014-06-18 | House | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-18 | House | House read and passed |
2014-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-16 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2014-06-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/16/2014) |
2014-05-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |