RI H8233 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows Yamil Baez to join Roshni Darnal and Juan Espinoza in marriage on or about August 17, 2018, within the Town of Smithfield, Rhode Island.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-07 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27HouseEffective without Governor's signature
2018-06-19HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-19SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2018-06-14SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/19/2018)
2018-06-14SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2018-06-08SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/14/2018)
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2018-06-07HouseHouse read and passed
2018-06-01HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (06/07/2018)
2018-05-29HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-05-25HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/29/2018)
2018-05-24HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback