RI H8225 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 22 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Senate passed in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the city of Pawtucket to issue not more than $1,000,000 general obligation bonds, notes and other evidences of indebtedness to finance the construction, reconstruction and repair of bridges and all costs incidental or related thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing The City Of Pawtucket To Provide For The Construction, Reconstruction And Repair Of Bridges And All Costs Incidental Or Related Thereto And Authorizing The Financing Thereof, Including The Issue Of Not More Than $1,000,000 Bonds, Notes And Other Evidences Of Indebtedness Therefor, To Fund The Capital Improvement Program For The Two Fiscal Years 2020 And 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-21 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-22SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2018-06-22SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/22/2018)
2018-06-21HouseHouse read and passed
2018-06-20HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/21/2018)
2018-06-20HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-06-18HouseScheduled for consideration (06/20/2018)
2018-06-05HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-06-01HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2018)
2018-05-23HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback