RI H8223 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CRIMINAL OFFENSES -- THREATS AND EXTORTION - Considers state government caseworkers or investigators "public officials" for purposes of the prohibition on making threats to public officials.
Title
Considers state government caseworkers or investigators "public officials" for purposes of the prohibition on making threats to public officials.
Sponsors
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Jose Batista [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] |
Rep. Thomas Noret [D] | Rep. Ramon Perez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-05-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/07/2024) |
2024-05-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H8223.pdf |