RI H8215 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Allows waiver of prior claimed common law rights by corp./LLC officers/Enlarges advisory council from 16 to 17 members/Imposes certain limitations on payments to injured employees/Authorizes uninsured protection fund to promulgate rules and regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' Compensation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28HouseSigned by Governor
2018-06-26HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-23SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-23SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-20HouseHouse passed Sub A
2018-06-20HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/20/2018)
2018-06-20HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-19HouseScheduled for consideration (06/20/2018)
2018-05-31HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-05-25HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/31/2018)
2018-05-23HouseIntroduced, referred to House Labor

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback