RI H8215 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Allows waiver of prior claimed common law rights by corp./LLC officers/Enlarges advisory council from 16 to 17 members/Imposes certain limitations on payments to injured employees/Authorizes uninsured protection fund to promulgate rules and regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' Compensation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20HouseHouse passed Sub A
2018-06-20HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/20/2018)
2018-06-20HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-19HouseScheduled for consideration (06/20/2018)
2018-05-31HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-05-25HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/31/2018)
2018-05-23HouseIntroduced, referred to House Labor

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback