RI H8207 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - Meeting postponed (06/06/2018)
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - Meeting postponed (06/06/2018)
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Medicaid eligible non-emergency medical transportation act.
Title
Medicaid Eligible Non-emergency Medical Transportation Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | House | Meeting postponed (06/06/2018) |
2018-06-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-05-17 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H8207.pdf |