RI H8206 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on May 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes the requirement that (5%) of the hotel tax be paid to the Greater Providence-Warwick Convention and Visitors Bureau and redistribute the (5%) tax to the regional tourism district where the hotel or residential unit is located.
Title
Tourism And Development
Sponsors
Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Stephen Casey [D] |
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Jacquelyn Baginski [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] | Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-05-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/11/2022) |
2022-05-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H8206.pdf |