RI H8203 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-22 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-22 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages (would Allow Luke Connory To Join Lauren Crowley Wagner And Justin Lee Case In Marriage Within The Town Of North Kingstown, Rhode Island, On Or About August 28, 2010)
Title
An Act Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages (would Allow Luke Connory To Join Lauren Crowley Wagner And Justin Lee Case In Marriage Within The Town Of North Kingstown, Rhode Island, On Or About August 28, 2010)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-22 | Effective without Governor's signature | |
2010-06-14 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-06-11 | Senate passed in concurrence | |
2010-06-09 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar | |
2010-06-01 | House read and passed |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/HouseText10/H8203.pdf |