RI H8200 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the Town of Jamestown to issue not more than $2,900,000 bonds and notes to finance various improvements at the town of Jamestown's golf course and facilities and related equipment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing The Town Of Jamestown To Issue General Obligation Bonds And Notes In An Amount Not To Exceed $2,900,000 To Finance New Construction, Demolition, Renovations And/or Improvements To Jamestown Golf Course And Facilities At 245 Conanicus Avenue And Related Equipment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-14 - House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-10HouseEffective without Governor's signature
2018-07-02HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-19SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2018-06-19SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/19/2018)
2018-06-14HouseHouse read and passed
2018-06-08HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/14/2018)
2018-06-07HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-06-05HouseScheduled for consideration (06/07/2018)
2018-05-24HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-05-18HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2018)
2018-05-16HouseIntroduced, referred to House Municipal Government

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback