RI H8194 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-29 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/29/2018)
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-29 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/29/2018)
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases Central Falls retiree pension benefits.
Title
Central Falls Retiree Pension Benefits
Sponsors
Rep. James McLaughlin [D] | Rep. Mary Messier [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] |
Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/29/2018) |
2018-05-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-05-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H8194.pdf |