RI H8193 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes Newport to set the effective tax rate applicable to any property class in an amount not to exceed by 50% the rate applicable to any other class in the first year following a comprehensive revaluation or any update.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Levy And Assessment Of Local Taxes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-05 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28HouseSigned by Governor
2018-06-25HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-21SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2018-06-21SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/21/2018)
2018-06-19SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2018-06-15SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2018)
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Senate Finance
2018-06-05HouseHouse read and passed
2018-06-01HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/05/2018)
2018-05-24HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-05-18HouseScheduled for consideration (05/24/2018)
2018-05-17HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-05-11HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2018)
2018-05-11HouseIntroduced, referred to House Municipal Government

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback