RI H8193 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Newport to set the effective tax rate applicable to any property class in an amount not to exceed by 50% the rate applicable to any other class in the first year following a comprehensive revaluation or any update.
Title
Levy And Assessment Of Local Taxes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-05 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-28 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-06-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/21/2018) |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2018) |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate Finance |
2018-06-05 | House | House read and passed |
2018-06-01 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/05/2018) |
2018-05-24 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-05-18 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/24/2018) |
2018-05-17 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2018) |
2018-05-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |